62 x 9 roughly 60 x 10= 600 so 62 x 9 is roughly 600
48 x 12 roughly 50 x 10 =500 so 48 x 12 is roughly 500
98 x 11 roughly 100 x 10 = 1000 so 98 x 11 is roughly 1000
63 x 29 roughly 60 x 30 =1800 so 63 x 29 is roughly 1800
79+39+18 is roughly 80 + 40+ 20 = 140 so 79 + 39 + 18 is roughly 140

48×12 is roughly the same as 50×10=500 so 48×12 is roughly 500
98 x 11 is roughly the same as 100 x10=1000 so 98 x 11 is roughly 1000
63 x 29 is roughly the same as 60 x 30 =1800 so 63 x 29 is roughly 1800

62×9 is roughly the same as 60×10=600 is roughly 600
48×12 is roughly the same as 50×10=500 is roughly 500
98×11 is roughly the same as 100×10=1000 is roughly 1000
63×29 is roughly the same as 60×30=1800 is roughly 1800

18 x 19 roughly 20 x 20 = 400 so 18 x 19 is roughly 400.

62 x 9 roughly 60 x 10= 600 so 62 x 9 is roughly 600

48 x 12 roughly 50 x 10 =500 so 48 x 12 is roughly 500

98 x 11 roughly 100 x 10 = 1000 so 98 x 11 is roughly 1000

63 x 29 roughly 60 x 30 =1800 so 63 x 29 is roughly 1800

79+39+18 is roughly 80 + 40+ 20 = 140 so 79 + 39 + 18 is roughly 140

48×12 is roughly the same as 50×10=500 so 48×12 is roughly 500

98 x 11 is roughly the same as 100 x10=1000 so 98 x 11 is roughly 1000

63 x 29 is roughly the same as 60 x 30 =1800 so 63 x 29 is roughly 1800

62×9 is roughly the same as 60×10=600 is roughly 600

48×12 is roughly the same as 50×10=500 is roughly 500

98×11 is roughly the same as 100×10=1000 is roughly 1000

63×29 is roughly the same as 60×30=1800 is roughly 1800

realy nice maths you have been realy focused

Insha I’m going to set a challenge for you

Could you do all five sums. How was the work insha.